Cone v. Rainbow Play Systems, Inc.

Case Number: 4:2006cv04128
Filed: July 21, 2006
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Discovery; granting 55 Motion to Compel. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/21/09. (SLW)
December 16, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and ORDER denying 63 Motion to Discover re: Performance Agreement. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/16/09. (SLW)
May 13, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 5/12/10. (CMS)
July 15, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiff's request to proceed with a reckless endangerment claim is denied. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/15/10. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cone v. Rainbow Play Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.