Kroupa v. 4-H et al

Defendant: Mary Does, 4-H, Peter A. Nielsen, Rod Geppert and John Does
Plaintiff: Greg Kroupa
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv04046
Filed: March 14, 2012
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Aurora
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 9 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are enjoined from interfering with B.K.'s participation in any 4-H activities until further order of the court. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/12/2012. (KC)
August 29, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/29/2012. (KC)
December 18, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/18/2013. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kroupa v. 4-H et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Does
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4-H
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Nielsen
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Geppert
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Gary P. Thimsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Kroupa
Represented By: Rollyn H. Samp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]