Thompson v. United States of America

Petitioner: Brandon Quincy Thompson
Respondent: United States of America
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv04133
Filed: July 13, 2012
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Referring Judge: John E. Simko
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion; granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 2/25/13. (DJP)
April 24, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 41 Government's Motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 4/24/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney-Client Privilege Waiver)(DJP)
October 6, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 64 Report and Recommendation; overruling 68 Objection to Report and Recommendation, denying petition for writ of habeas corpus, and declining to issue certificate of appealability. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/6/2014. (KC) Modified text on 10/6/2014 (SLW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thompson v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Quincy Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Mark Edward Salter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]