Miller v. Huron Regional Medical Center, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Linda A. Miller
Defendant: Huron Regional Medical Center, Inc., Cy B. Haatvedt and Michael H. Becker
Case Number: 4:2012cv04138
Filed: July 25, 2012
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/22/2014. (KC)
June 13, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 21 Motion to Compel and 22 Motion to Produce. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 6/13/13. (SLW)
October 23, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 51 Motion to Intervene; quashing the subpoena served by Linda A. Miller, M.D. on ProAssurance; lifting the stay of the Amended Order of September 4, 2013; amending the Scheduling Order as stated. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 10-23-13. (DJP)
December 20, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 12/20/13. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Huron Regional Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A. Miller
Represented By: Bradley P. Gordon
Represented By: Kenneth E. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huron Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cy B. Haatvedt
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz
Represented By: Kathryn Jean Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. Becker
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz
Represented By: Kathryn Jean Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.