Mathison v. Berkebile

Petitioner: Eugene H. Mathison
Respondent: David Berkebile
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv04156
Filed: August 30, 2012
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Aurora
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Stay. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/14/12. (DJP)
December 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Respondent is allowed to brief the issue of judicial estoppel by December 31, 2013); granting 12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; holding in abeyance 4 Motion for Bail pending the Court's consideration of Respondent's submission regardinge estoppel. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/20/13. (Attachments: # 1 9/17/08 Mathison pro se petition pursuant to 28 USC 2241, # 2 10/14/08 Oppotision to Motion for Release in Mathison v. Wiley, # 3 3/26/09 Order and Judgment in Mathison v. Wiley) (DJP)
January 3, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Estoppel and Bail. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/3/14. (SLW)
April 8, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: Vacating Convictions and Resentencing. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 4/8/14. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mathison v. Berkebile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene H. Mathison
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon Falon
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Berkebile
Represented By: Jan Leslie Holmgren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]