Scheetz v. Weber et al

Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota and Douglas Weber
Petitioner: Daryl T. Scheetz
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv04011
Filed: January 28, 2013
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Referring Judge: John E. Simko
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Scheetz may have until June 14, 2013, to file a substantive responsive brief. Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 5/31/13. (DJP)
August 19, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 21 Objection to Report and Recommendation. The South Dakota trial court file including the plea agreement and the sentencing transcript, if there is one, shall be provided to this Court on or before 9/4/13. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/19/13. (SLW)
September 11, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 5 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying as untimely and moot 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Equitable Tolling; denying 1 PETITION for Writ of H abeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254; denying 21 Petitioner's Objection to that portion of the Report and Recommendation which found no showing of a denial of a constitutional right; adopting 18 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on portion of the Report and Recommendation which found no showing of a denial of a constitutional right; no Certificate of Appealability shall be issued. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/11/13. (CMS)
February 5, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Signed by US Magistrate Judge John E. Simko on 1/5/13. (CMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Scheetz v. Weber et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Douglas Weber
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daryl T. Scheetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]