Finkle et al v. Regency CSP Ventures Limited Partnership et al

Defendant: Regency CSP Ventures Limited Partnership and Regency Inns Management Inc.
Plaintiff: Philip Finkle and Graci Finkle
Counter_claimant: Regency Inns Management Inc. and Regency CSP Ventures Limited Partnership
Counter_defendant: Philip Finkle
Case Number: 4:2013cv04019
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 72 MOTION For Ruling on Proper Application of Comparative Negligence Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/17/14. (SLW)
October 15, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 25 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by U. S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/15/13. (DJP)
June 18, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 6/18/2014. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finkle et al v. Regency CSP Ventures Limited Partnership et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency CSP Ventures Limited Partnership
Represented By: Melanie L. Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Inns Management Inc.
Represented By: Melanie L. Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Finkle
Represented By: Steven C. Beardsley
Represented By: Michael S. Beardsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graci Finkle
Represented By: Steven C. Beardsley
Represented By: Michael S. Beardsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Regency Inns Management Inc.
Represented By: Melanie L. Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Regency CSP Ventures Limited Partnership
Represented By: Melanie L. Carpenter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Philip Finkle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]