United States of America v. Harvey et al

Defendant: Harvey Special Trist U/D/T, The Harvey Family Living Trust, Colleen M. Harvey and Pure Freedom Foundation
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2013cv04023
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Aurora
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss; granting 6 Motion to Strike. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/11/2013. (KC)
December 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Strike answer and counterclaim. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/18/2013. (KC)
June 2, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER substituting United States as sole counterclaim defendant. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/2/2014. (KC)
June 2, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 20 Motion to Strike; denying 25 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 26 Motion to Strike. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/2/2014. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Harvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Special Trist U/D/T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Harvey Family Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Freedom Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Erin E. Lindgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.