Janis et al v. Nelson et al

Plaintiff: Eileen Janis and Kim Colhoff
Defendant: Chris Nelson, Paula Jones, Gail Brock, Christopher W. Madsen, Richard Casey, Karen M. Layher, Linda Lea M. Viken and Sue Ganje
 
Case Number: 5:2009cv05019
Filed: February 18, 2009
 
Court: South Dakota District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Voting Office
County: Shannon
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Referring Judge: Roger L. Wollman
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 55 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 74 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/24/2009. (KC)
November 24, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/24/2009. (KC)
December 30, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/30/2009. (KC)
December 30, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Protective Order; granting 82 Motion to Extend Deadlines ( Discovery due by 4/9/2010, Motions due by 5/3/2010.); granting 83 Motion to Extend Deadlines ( Discovery due by 4/9/2010, Motions due by 5/3/2010); denying 92 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/30/2009. (KC)
October 2, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 38 Motion to Dismiss; granting 49 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/02/2009. (KC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Janis et al v. Nelson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Janis
Represented By: Patrick K. Duffy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Colhoff
Represented By: Patrick K. Duffy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Brock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Madsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Casey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen M. Layher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Lea M. Viken
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Ganje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]