Cabbagestalk v. Hardin et al

Defendant: Ofc Harruff, Cpl Hines, Alyson Glidewell, Head Quarters Grievance Branch, Ms Hardin, Tarcia James, S Terry and Lt Thompkins
Plaintiff: Shaheen Cabbagestalk
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv02974
Filed: October 31, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: McCormick
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff is to advise the court, in writing, of the following regarding the Complaint he originally filed in state court: (1) whether he is pursuing any claims for violations o f this federal constitutional rights pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 or any other kinds of claims under any other federal statute, constitutional provision, or treaty in this action; (2) whether he is only pursuing claims under the South Carolina Constitution and/or other South Carolina state laws; or (3) whether he is pursuing claims under both South Carolina and federal law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/14/2013. (mcot, )
June 25, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Court agrees with and adopts the R&R as the order of the Court. (Dkt. No. 113 ). Accordingly, the Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment, (Dkt No. 35 ), and denies Plaintiff's pending motions, (Dkt. Nos. 22 , 104 , 110 ). Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/24/2014. (mcot, )
March 18, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Court agrees with and adopt the R&R as the order of the Court. (Dkt. No. 50 ). Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for default judgment. (Dkt. No. 43 ). Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/17/2014. (mcot, )
April 15, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court agrees with and adopts the R&R as the order of the Court. (Dkt. No. 80 ). Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is denied. (Dkt. No. 53 ). Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/15/2014. (mcot, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cabbagestalk v. Hardin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc Harruff
Represented By: Steven Michael Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl Hines
Represented By: Steven Michael Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyson Glidewell
Represented By: Steven Michael Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Head Quarters Grievance Branch
Represented By: Steven Michael Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Hardin
Represented By: Steven Michael Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarcia James
Represented By: Steven Michael Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Terry
Represented By: Steven Michael Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Thompkins
Represented By: Steven Michael Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaheen Cabbagestalk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]