Ilar et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al (TV2)

Plaintiff: James Ilar and Kristi Ilar
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2012cv00304
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Anderson
Referring Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Amend Complaint in case 3:12-cv-00304-TAV-CCS; denying 13 Motion to Amend Complaint in case 3:12-cv-00424-TAV-CCS. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 02/28/2014. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00304-TAV-CCS, 3:12-cv-00424-TAV-CCS (c/m to J. Skipper Ray)(KAW)
March 18, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (30) Motion to Quash (Notice of Deposition for a deposition on March 20, 2014 is QUASHED); denying without prejudice (32) Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting (26) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:12-cv- 00304-PLR-CCS; denying (17) Motion to Amend Complaint; granting (21) Motion to Quash (Notice of Deposition for a deposition on March 20, 2014 is QUASHED); denying without prejudice (23) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 3:12-cv-00424-PLR-CCS. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 03/18/2014. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00304-PLR-CCS, 3:12-cv-00424-PLR-CCS (KAW)
August 12, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney John Frank Higgins. Mr. Higgins shall turn over his file to the Plaintiffs, and after doing so and complying with the Courts instructions below, both Mr. Higgins a nd Mr. Street are RELIEVED of their duties as counsel in this matter. As of the entry of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiffs James Ilar and Kristi Ilar are DEEMED to be proceeding pro se, unless and until they obtain a new attorney, and they ar e hereby ADMONISHED that they must stay up to date on the status of this case and comply with the deadlines set by the Court or deadlines agreed to by counsel on their behalf. Further, the Plaintiffs, like any other party, will be expected to comp ly with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules, and the Court's Orders. The Clerk of Court SHALL MAIL a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Plaintiffs, and Mr. Higgins is ORDERED to mail copies of all documents filed in this case through CM/ECF since July 24, 2014, to the Plaintiffs at no cost to the Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on August 12, 2014. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-00304-PLR-CCS, 3:12-cv-00424-PLR-CCS Order mailed to Plaintiffs. (RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ilar et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al (TV2)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ilar
Represented By: Jonathan A Street
Represented By: John Frank Higgins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Ilar
Represented By: John Frank Higgins
Represented By: Jonathan A Street
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Lenders Network USA, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]