Chaves v. CWA

Plaintiff: Hugo Ernesto Chaves
Defendant: CWA
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00589
Filed: November 9, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Fifth Amendment Claim is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on May 16, 2013. (mailed to Mr. Chaves) (AYB)
March 13, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as set forth in following order. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/13/14. (c/m)(ABF)
March 25, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 03/25/2014.(c/m to Mr. Chaves) (KAW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chaves v. CWA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Ernesto Chaves
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]