Safety Point Productions LLC v. Does 1-57

Plaintiff: Safety Point Productions LLC
Defendant: Does 1-57
Case Number: 3:2012cv00601
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Phillips
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 16 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision. Defendant Doe #16's objections [Doc. 16] to the magistrate judges pretrial order are hereby OVERRULED in their entirety. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/05/2013. (KMK) Modified on 4/5/2013 (KMK): copy mailed
April 24, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Quash and denying 18 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on April 24, 2013. (mailed to Mr. Trocsch) (AYB)
December 19, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference as set forth more fully herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on December 19, 2012. (AYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safety Point Productions LLC v. Does 1-57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safety Point Productions LLC
Represented By: Van R Irion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.