Gilmore v. Roane County et al

Defendant: Mike Carter, Richard Stooksbury, David Randle, Robert Cooker, Mike Myers, Roane County, TN Gov't and Mitch Gritsby
Plaintiff: Shasta Lashay Gilmore
Case Number: 3:2013cv00124
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Roane
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 108 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 119 Motion ; denying 120 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision; denying 123 Motion to Strike ; denying 133 Motion for Leave to File Document; denying 135 Motion for Sanctions; denying 138 Motion for Hearing; denying 140 Motion for Leave to File Document; denying 142 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/5/14. (JBR)
October 25, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1) Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 8 and 24 and Motion for Summary Judgment 48 as it pertains to Plaintiff's medical malpractice claim against the Roane County government and the medic defendants is hereby GRANTED; 2) Defendants' Motion to Strike 41 is hereby DENIED; and Plaintiffs' Rule 41 Motion to allow her to file a limited nonsuit 54 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge David L Bunning on October 25, 2013. (AYB)
January 14, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 1. The parties SHALL make their initial disclosures on or before February 7, 2014;1 and 2. The parties SHALL conduct their discovery conference as soon after that date as is practicable.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 01/14/2014. (KAW)
June 24, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Motion to Amend 85 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to refile as appropriate pursuant to any deadlines set by the District Judge. Additionally, the Court finds that the Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing 88 , which moves the Court to permit oral arguments on the Motion to Amend, is moot, and it is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 6/24/14. (JBR)
July 11, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 89 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve counsel for the Defendants with full and complete responses to the interrogatories and requests for production served February 21, 2014, on or before August 1, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/11/14. (JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Roane County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Carter
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stooksbury
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Randle
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cooker
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Myers
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roane County, TN Gov't
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Gritsby
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Represented By: P Alexander Vogel
Represented By: Jeffrey R Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shasta Lashay Gilmore
Represented By: John M Wolfe, Jr
Represented By: John M Wolfe, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]