Cherry v. Macon Hospital, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Cherry
Defendant: Macon Hospital, Inc. and Hanna C. Ilia
Case Number: 2:2012cv00043
Filed: May 23, 2012
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Cookeville Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Plaintiff's pleadings and the caption herein be amended by interlineation to properly reflect Defendant Celina Fire Department EMS as Town of Celina, Tennessee. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/27/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 27, 2013 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Because of pending motions in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the case management conference presently scheduled for January 6, 2014 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of these motions. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/27/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 29, 2014 228 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 8/29/2014 (dt).
August 29, 2014 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the court finds as follows: The Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Celina Fire Department EMS (the "Town") 189 is GRANTED. The Town's Motion to Dismiss [ 154] is DENIED AS MOOT. The Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Clay County E911 Board (the "911 Board") 169 is GRANTED. The 911 Board's Motion to Dismiss 167 is DENIED AS MOOT. All claims against the Town and the 911 Board are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 29, 2014 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone conference will be held on Friday, September 5, 2014, at 3:30 p.m. in order to reset the trial. Counsel for the parties should call (615) 695-2858 in order to participate in the telephone conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/29/14. (dt)
August 6, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 1/1/2013. Discovery due by 12/1/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2013. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/6/12. (dt)
February 5, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Trial resetting: This case is reset for jury trial on Tuesday, January 14, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 873 of the United States Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Pretrial conference resetting: A pretrial conference shall b e held in Judge Trauger's chambers, Room 825 United States Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee, on January 10, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. Lead counsel for each party must attend the pretrial conference. If lead counsel is not from Tennessee, local counsel must also attend. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/5/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
June 26, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The instant Motion is not a pleading, and, therefore, it cannot be stricken. Therefore, Plaintiff's "Motion to Strike" is DENIED. Plaintiff's Alternative Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply is, however, GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his Sur-Reply within fourteen (14) days from the entry of the instant Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
July 1, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The deadline for the filing of the joint mediation report shall be EXTENDED from July 1 to August 1, 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/1/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry v. Macon Hospital, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cherry
Represented By: Joseph Paul Bednarz, Sr.
Represented By: D. Bruce Kehoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon Hospital, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna C. Ilia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]