Nelson v. Putnam County Justice Center et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Nelson
Defendant: Medical Staff
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00029
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Cookeville Office
County: Putnam
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/8/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la) Modified text on 7/9/2013 (la).
April 15, 2013 3 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/15/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 30, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER: After the Court's review of Plaintiff's pro se Complaint, the Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 40 ) is hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED and this case is hereby DISMISSED. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 1/30/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nelson v. Putnam County Justice Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]