Hutchison v. Putnam County Court Sheriff Dept. et al

Defendant: Court City Clerk's Office, Putnam County Court Sheriff Dept. and D. A. Putnam County
Plaintiff: Jason Edward Hutchison
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00033
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Cookeville Office
County: Putnam
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/11/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
August 27, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By Order entered on the docket on July 11, 2013 (Docket No. 14 ) by the Honorable Kevin H. Sharp, Plaintiff was granted permission to file an amended complaint in this action to substitute named defendants for John Doe. Therefore, the deadlin e for Plaintiff to serve limited discovery to ascertain the identities of the John Doe defendants is September 30, 2013. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint with the identities of the John Doe defendants on or before October 30, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/27/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
November 12, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 11/12/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (afs)
February 11, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Docket Entry No. 23 ) is hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED; and Plaintiff Jason Edward Hutchison's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in a separate document in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 2/11/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hutchison v. Putnam County Court Sheriff Dept. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court City Clerk's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County Court Sheriff Dept.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. A. Putnam County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Edward Hutchison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]