The Bank of Nashville v. Sarmadi et al

 
Case Number: 3:2006cv00775
Filed: August 9, 2006
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2009 216 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the BAS parties motion for default judgment 202 be GRANTED, and that judgment be entered against Mr. Crutcher in the amount of $592,412.86. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/11/09. (cc: Andrew Brown Crutcher, 103 SE Broad Street, Murfreesboro, TN 37130 by reg and cert mail)(km)
August 18, 2009 221 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Bryant Recommends that Ms. Campbell's Second Motion for Default Judgment 195 be GRANTED, and that judgment be entered against Mr. Crutcher in the amount of $761,270.93. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/18/09. (cc: Crutcher by reg. & cert. mail) (dt) Modified Text on 8/19/2009 (dt).
September 1, 2009 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On 8/11/2009, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation 216 , to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, the Motion For Default Judgment against Andrew Crutcher filed by the BAS parties 202 is GRANTED, and the BAS parties are awarded judgment on their crossclaim against Mr. Crutcher in the total amount of $592,412.86. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/1/09. (cc: Mr. Crutcher by reg. & cert. mail) (dt)
September 2, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On 8/18/2009, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation 221 , to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion For Default Judgment as to Andrew Brown Crutcher filed by defendant/cross-plaintiff Peggy Campbell 195 is GRANTED, and judgment is hereby entered against Mr. Crutcher in favor of Ms. Campbell in the amount of $761,270.93. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/2/09. (dt) (cc: Mr. Crutcher by reg. & cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2009: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt) (dt). Modified Text on 9/3/2009 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The Bank of Nashville v. Sarmadi et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]