Linfoot et al v. MD Helicopters, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gary Linfoot and Mari Lyn Linfoot
Defendant: MD Helicopters, Inc., L-3 Communications Corporation and Kamatics Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00639
Filed: July 10, 2009
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2013 130 Featured Case SECOND AGREED AMENDMENT TO STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/29/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 20, 2013 135 Featured Case ORDER granting 134 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 5/20/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 3, 2013 143 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant McDonnell Douglas Helicopter Company (MDHC) filed with the Court a renewed motion for summary judgment on March 28, 2012, as to choice of law and the application of a 10-year statute of repose relevant to Plaintiffs' claims against MDHC. It appears to the Court that the status of the parties' Touhy request may be relevant in resolving MDHC's motion for summary judgment. Therefore, Plaintiffs and MDHC shall provide supplemental notice to the Court of the current status of discovery from the Army by November 1, 2013. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
February 18, 2014 164 Featured Case ORDER: The Court will grant Plaintiffs' request to depose up to three of the five individuals described in Plaintiffs' supplemental notice. Plaintiffs have 90 days to take these depositions and notify the Court of any information discove red that is relevant to MDHC's statute-of-repose defense. MDHC will have 15 days to respond to Plaintiffs' supplemental notice. The Court will then rule on the pending motion. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 2/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 9, 2010 91 Featured Case MEMORANDUM. An appropriate Order is filed herewith. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 11/9/10. (Attachments: # 1 Text Search Memo)(tmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Linfoot et al v. MD Helicopters, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Linfoot
Represented By: Martin Stephen Sir
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mari Lyn Linfoot
Represented By: Martin Stephen Sir
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Helicopters, Inc.
Represented By: R. Dale Bay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L-3 Communications Corporation
Represented By: Dale Tuttle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamatics Corporation
Represented By: Thomas H. Dundon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]