Jenkins v. Montgomery County

Plaintiff: D'Angelo Marquez Jenkins
Defendant: Montgomery County
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv01010
Filed: October 23, 2009
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Deft's 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED, Pltf's 106 MOTION to Amend be DENIED and Pltf's 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment be DENIED. Any party has 14 days from receipt of this Report and Recommendation in which to file any written objections to it with the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 11/05/2010. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(ab)
November 5, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 103 and 107 Motions for Extension of Time to Amend and Motion to waive costs; denying as moot 108 Motion to Compel; denying 128 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 129 Motion to Ascertain Status of Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 11/05/2010. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(ab)
November 30, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORDANDUM AND ORDER: The 132 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons stated therein and herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' 121 Motion for Summ ary Judgment is GRANTED, the plaintiff's 113 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, and the plaintiff's 106 Motion to Add a Defendant is DENIED. On November 9, 2010, the plaintiff filed a 136 motion to be appointed counsel to assist him in preparing for trial. As there will not be a trial, this motion is DENIED. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/30/2010. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(ab)
October 28, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 26 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by D'Angelo Marquez Jenkins be GRANTED except as to the naming of the Montgomery County Jail Mail Room as defendant; that all claims against Montgomery County, as well as the claims against defendants Weatherbee and Armstrong in their official capacities, be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; and, that the claim against defendants Weatherbee and Armstrong in their indiv idual capacities be allowed to go forward. Plaintiff has 10 days from receipt of this Report and Recommendation in which to file any written objections to it with the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 10/28/09. (xc: Pltf by reg. and cert. mail)(ab)
November 25, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On October 28, 2009, the Magistrate Judge issued a Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 46 ), to which no timely objections have been filed. The Report and Recommendation is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion To Amend (Docket No. 26 ) is GRANTED, except as to the naming of the Montgomery County Jail Mail Room as a defendant. It is further ORDERED tha t all claims against Montgomery County and against defendants Weatherbee and Armstrong in their official capacities are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(A)(b)(1), for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff's "Motion to Add a Defendant" (Docket No. 52 ), is GRANTED. The court construes this motion as an attempt to add as named defendants John Does 1, 2 and 3, the names of whom he will learn during the discove ry process. These are the three individuals against whom the plaintiff has been attempting to assert a claim regarding the opening of his legal mail, which claim remains in the case lodged at the moment only against the John Does. This case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further handling. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 25th day of November 20009. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/25/09. (xc: Plaintiff by regular & certified mail)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jenkins v. Montgomery County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Angelo Marquez Jenkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]