Tennessee Football, Inc. v. Kiffin Featured Case

Plaintiff: Tennessee Football, Inc.
Defendant: Lane Monte Kiffin and University of Southern California
Case Number: 3:2010cv00727
Filed: July 30, 2010
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2011 23 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re 22 Order Dismissing Case. (hb)
April 12, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER: It appearing to the Court that the parties have stipulated to a dismissal with prejudice, it is therefore ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 4/12/2011. (hb)
April 8, 2011 21 PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by All Parties. (Boston, Robert)
April 8, 2011 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by University of Southern California, Lane Monte Kiffin, Tennessee Football, Inc.. (Boston, Robert)
March 14, 2011 19 CIVIL NOTICE: A telephonic status conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, 3/29/11 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (rd)
January 19, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER: The present scheduling deadlines will remain unchanged absent a request by any parties for a modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 1/19/11. (rd)
January 18, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown: Telephone Conference held on 1/18/2011. Order to enter. (mk)
November 30, 2010 17 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 11/29/10. (rd)
November 24, 2010 16 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 11/24/10. (rd)
November 22, 2010 15 JOINT MOTION for Agreed Protective Order by University of Southern California, Lane Monte Kiffin, Tennessee Football, Inc. (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Riley, Steven) Modified on 11/23/2010 (rd).
October 4, 2010 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tennessee Football, Inc.. (Boston, Robert)
September 14, 2010 13 ANSWER to Complaint by University of Southern California, Lane Monte Kiffin.(Riley, Steven)
September 14, 2010 12 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties shall serve their initial disclosures by 9/28/10. All fact depositions shall be completed by 3/15/11. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 4/5/11. A jury trial is set for 9:00 a.m. on 8/2/2011 in Courtroom 774 before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. The pretrial conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on 7/22/11. A telephone conference is set for 1:30 p.m. on 1/18/2011 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/14/10. (rd)
September 14, 2010 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/14/2010. Order to enter. (rd)
September 13, 2010 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (CORRECTED) filed by All Parties. (Boston, Robert)
September 10, 2010 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (INITIAL) filed by All Parties. (Boston, Robert)
August 17, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion to lift stay on discovery, allow Defendant until Sept 14, 2010 to respond and change case conference to Sept 14, 2010 at 9:30 AM (Brown, Joe)
August 16, 2010 7 MOTION to Modify and Lift Stay of Discovery (Unopposed) by University of Southern California, Lane Monte Kiffin. (Riley, Steven)
August 3, 2010 6 Featured Case ORDER: District Judge Aleta A. Trauger recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge John T. Nixon for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/3/10. (rd)
August 2, 2010 5 Featured Case ORDER: Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Aleta A. Trauger for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/2/10. (rd)
August 2, 2010 Bar status for attorneys Mark W. Peters, Mary Beth Thomas, Robert Earl Boston, James N. Bowen, John. W. Peterson, Steven Allen Riley of TN verified as active on this date. (eh)
August 2, 2010 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday 9/27/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (eh)
August 2, 2010 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by University of Southern California, Lane Monte Kiffin. (Peterson, John)
July 30, 2010 2 NOTICE from USDC Clerk regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement requirement (eh)
July 30, 2010 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by University of Southern California, Lane Monte Kiffin from Chancery Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 10-1197-II.Filing fee paid $350. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Chancery Court Complaint, # 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Football, Inc. v. Kiffin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Football, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Earl Boston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Monte Kiffin
Represented By: James N. Bowen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Southern California
Represented By: James N. Bowen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]