Tuttobene v. The Assurance Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eric Tuttobene, Timothy Mark Byrd, Robert Souvannareth, William F. Kyte, Jeannie Pond, Derrold Nash, Anthony Petitti, Jr., J. Reid Carleton, Jeff Heybrock, Gregory Todd Byrd, John Pierce, James Chandler Beck, Allen Bare and Todd Boe
Defendant: The Assurance Group, Inc., Edward Lee Shackelford, Beverly Hackworth Shackelford, William Curt Klein, Mark Carter and Duane Vestal
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00978
Filed: October 18, 2010
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2014 102 Featured Case ORDER: A telephone conference was held with the parties at their request in this matter to discuss scheduling in reference to the Court's earlier order 100 . After discussion with the parties the in-court conference presently set for March 31, 2014 93 is CANCELED. Discovery due by 5/23/2014. Jury Trial set for 3/31/2015 before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2015 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Telephone Conference set for 6 /12/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. To participate in the conference call, parties will call 615-695-2851 at the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 3/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 3, 2014 117 Featured Case ORDER: The parties are requested to provide the Magistrate Judge with a progress report, an agreed protocol, and an agreed auditor on or before August 4, 2014. A Telephone Conference to discuss the report, and if necessary, to approve or complete the adoption of a protocol and an auditor is set for 8/12/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/3/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 5, 2014 119 Featured Case AGREED ORDER granting 118 Extension of Time to Submit Progress Report, Agreed Protocol, and Agreed Auditor. Reports due by 8/7/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/5/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 12, 2014 122 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING: The Magistrate Judge believes that an appointment of an expert witness would be the most efficient way to proceed in this case, and believes the firm of Carr Riggs & Ingram is the most appropriate. Provided they are willing to undertake the appointment of court expert, a hearing is set for 1:30 p.m., Monday, September 8, 2014 to finalize an appointment order for this firm. The lead auditor for the firm should attend this hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/12/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 15, 2014 124 Featured Case AGREED ORDER re 123 Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Response due 8/25/2014. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 8/15/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 26, 2014 126 Featured Case ORDER granting 125 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant will file its Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on or before September 24, 2014. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 8/26/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
July 12, 2012 62 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/12/12. (rd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tuttobene v. The Assurance Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Tuttobene
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Mark Byrd
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Souvannareth
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Kyte
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Pond
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrold Nash
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Petitti, Jr.
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Reid Carleton
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Heybrock
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Todd Byrd
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pierce
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chandler Beck
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Bare
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Boe
Represented By: William Kennerly Burger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Assurance Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lee Shackelford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Hackworth Shackelford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Curt Klein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Vestal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]