Simpkins et al v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County et al

Plaintiff: Syed Bokhari, Allen VanPliet and Metro Livery, Inc.
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Director of the Metro Transportation Licensing Commission and Metropolitan Transportation Licensing Commission of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2011cv00088
Filed: February 1, 2011
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/3/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(rd)
March 25, 2014 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Clerk's Taxation of Costs 183 is GRANTED and the Court hereby DENIES Defendant's Bill of Costs 175 . Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/25/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 13, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant Metropolitan Transportation Licensing Commission: The parties' Stipulation of Dismissal is accepted and, accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is Denied as moot. Metropolitan Transportation Licensing Commission of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee terminated. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/13/11. (dt)
January 19, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 1/19/12. (afs)
January 19, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, the Court hereby enters the following rulings: (1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 43) is hereby DENIED; and (2) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Brian McQuistion (Dock et No. 12) is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. This case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further pretrial case management in accordance with the Order of reference previously entered in this case. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 1/19/12. (afs)
April 9, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/9/12. (rd)
April 9, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, pltfs' 59 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED, and deft's 64 Motion to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT. The case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further pretrial case management. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/9/12. (rd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpkins et al v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Bokhari
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Represented By: William H. Mellor
Represented By: Robert J. McNamara
Represented By: Wesley Hottot
Represented By: G. Kerry Haymaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen VanPliet
Represented By: G. Kerry Haymaker
Represented By: Wesley Hottot
Represented By: Robert J. McNamara
Represented By: William H. Mellor
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Livery, Inc.
Represented By: G. Kerry Haymaker
Represented By: Wesley Hottot
Represented By: Robert J. McNamara
Represented By: William H. Mellor
Represented By: Steven M. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County
Represented By: Keli J. Oliver
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Sanders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of the Metro Transportation Licensing Commission
Represented By: Keli J. Oliver
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Sanders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transportation Licensing Commission of the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]