United States of America v. $61,050.00 United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $61,050.00 United States Currency
Claimant: Christina Hungerford
Case Number: 3:2011cv00125
Filed: February 14, 2011
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2011 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. The stay of discovery is hereby LIFTED. Prior to the initial case management conference, counsel for the parties shall confer and shall prepare a proposed, joint initial case management order. Counsel shall efile the proposed order prior to the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/5/11. (dt)
April 18, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 4/27/2011 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. If this rescheduled time presents a scheduling conflict for counsel, they shall confer and call Ms. Jeanne Cox, Courtroom Deputy, at 736-5164, to reschedule the initial case management conference. In all other respects, the 4/5/2011, order remains in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/18/11. (dt)
May 25, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to reset the case management conference. ICMC set for 5/27/2011, is Cancelled. The initial case management conference will be rescheduled if a motion to approve the minor settlement is not filed by 6/24/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/25/11. (dt)
June 13, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY OF DEFAULT: Upon motion of the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered as to all persons and entities except the Estate of Joshua Lars Strickland, Christina Hungerford, as surviving wife, heir and executrix of the Estate of Joshua Lars Strickland, Joshua Lars Strickland, Jr., as son and heirof Joshua Lars Strickland and Damarcus Strickland, as son and heir of Joshua Lars Strickland, Individually and Collectively who may have an interest in Defendant Property, as provided in Rule 55(a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 6/13/11. (dt)
July 5, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/14/2011 at 10:00 AM. Prior to the initial case management conference, counsel for the parties shall confer and shall prepare a proposed, joint initial case management order. Counsel shall e-file the proposed order prior to the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/5/11. (dt)
July 14, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: On 7/13/2011, the parties filed a joint motion to approve settlement agreement and mutual release 22 . As a result, the initial case management conference is Cancelled. The Clerk is directed to forward the file in this case to the Honorable T odd J. Campbell, Chief Judge, for his consideration of the parties' joint motion to approve settlement agreement and mutual release. Unless otherwise directed by the Court or upon motion of the parties, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/14/11. (dt)
July 14, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/14/11. (dt)
February 16, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By 2/28/2011, the plaintiff shall file a status report, indicating when notice to potential claimants will be made, when publication will be completed, and the anticipated deadlines for filing claims. If any claims are filed, an initial case management conference will be scheduled at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 2/16/11. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $61,050.00 United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $61,050.00 United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christina Hungerford
Represented By: Olin Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]