Blitz v. AgFeed Industries, Inc. et al

Defendant: AgFeed Industries, Inc., Gerard Daignault, Edward Pazdro, Songyan Li and Junhong Xiong
Plaintiff: Lawrence Blitz
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00992
Filed: October 18, 2011
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Lead Plaintiffs' opposition to U.S. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than March 10, 2014. Moving U.S. Defendants shall file reply memoranda, if any, in support of theirpending Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint no later than April10, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/21/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 15, 2014 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The stay is lifted, and the case is REOPENED. The case is referred to the Magistrate Judge to enter an appropriate scheduling order to bring this litigation to its conclusion. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2015 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J . Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2015 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 1/16/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/16/2015. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 28, 2014 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 218 Motion To Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 8, 2014 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In view of the foregoing, the instant Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 188 , 193 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/8/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
September 25, 2014 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Pending before the Court is a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 222 ), to which no Objections have been filed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation and the fil e. The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Accordingly, the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Goldman Kurland & Modhidin, LLP (Docket No. 186) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Goldman Kurland & Modhidin, LLP are DISMISSED.The remaining claims are the subject of a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, which will be heard in this Court on October 2, 2014. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/25/14. (afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blitz v. AgFeed Industries, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgFeed Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Overton Thompson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Daignault
Represented By: Overton Thompson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Pazdro
Represented By: Overton Thompson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Songyan Li
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junhong Xiong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Blitz
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Keith C. Dennen
Represented By: Gregory E. Del Gaizo
Represented By: James A. Crumlin, Jr.
Represented By: Conrad B. Stephens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]