CIT Small Business Lending Corporation v. Tiki Dreams, LLC et al

Defendant: Cuatro Enterprise, LLC, Kimberly B. Payne, Tillman W. Payne, III and Tiki Dreams, LLC
Plaintiff: CIT Small Business Lending Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00309
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/10/2012 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 5/18/12. (dt)
July 9, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 8/8/2012 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/9/12. (dt)
August 7, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/10/2012 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/7/12. (dt)
October 15, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has been advised by counsel that all remaining matters and things in controversy in this action have been compromised and settled. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 30 days, to reopen this action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 10/12/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 13, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER: This action is dismissed voluntarily without prejudice against the defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 11/13/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 2, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2012 at 2:00 PM, in Nashville, before District Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 4/2/12. (dt)
April 3, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2012 at 11:00 AM before District Judge William J. Haynes Jr. The parties shall file a proposed case management order 3 business days prior to 5/22/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/3/12. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIT Small Business Lending Corporation v. Tiki Dreams, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuatro Enterprise, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly B. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tillman W. Payne, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiki Dreams, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIT Small Business Lending Corporation
Represented By: Klinton W. Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]