A.O. Smith Corporation et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Opryland Attractions, LLC, Wildhorse Saloon Entertainment Ventures, Inc., OLH, G.P., Gaylord Hotels, Inc., A.O. Smith Corporation, Gaylord Entertainment Company, Opryland Hotel Nashville, LLC, Grand Ole Opry, LLC and Gaylord Program Services, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00429
Filed: April 30, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2012 14 Featured Case ORDER: Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 13 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 8/3/2012 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/25/12. (dt)
July 19, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/19/12. (dt)
July 24, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER: The parties shall be prepared to discuss the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint at the Initial Case Management Conference which is set for 8/3/2012, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/24/12. (dt)
August 6, 2012 24 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES) Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/6/12. (dt)
September 20, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Page Limit for its Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint. The United States' brief in support of its motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint shall not exceed eighty (80) pages. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/20/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 16, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER: In light of the recent Order 54 in the related case of Continental Insurance Company v. United States, Case No. 3-12-cv-0433, Plaintiffs' Response to the pending Motion to Dismiss 28 shall be filed by 12/17/2012. Any Reply shall be filed by 1/16/2013. The Court will hear argument on Defendant's Motion on 2/13/2013, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/16/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 10, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER: United States' Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limit for its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 37 is Granted. The United States shall have until 1/25/2013, to file its reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 1/10/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 28, 2013 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/28/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
February 28, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 28). The Court heard argument on Defendant's Motion on February 13, 2013. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/28/13. (af)
May 1, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Kevin H. Sharp for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/1/12. (dt)
May 2, 2012 9 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/2/12. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: A.O. Smith Corporation et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opryland Attractions, LLC
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildhorse Saloon Entertainment Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLH, G.P.
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaylord Hotels, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaylord Entertainment Company
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opryland Hotel Nashville, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Ole Opry, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaylord Program Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Head Moskal
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]