Continental Insurance Company et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: ABC Bus Companies Inc., Nissan North America, Metal One Holdings America, Inc., Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Verizon Communications. Inc., Qinetiq North America Operations LLC, Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co. Ltd. (U.S. Branch), Continental Insurance Company, Gibson Guitar Corp., Harris Corporation, OSG Ship Management, Inc., Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Carters Inc. and L-3 Communications Holdings Inc.
Defendant: United States of America and US Army Corps of Engineers
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00433
Filed: April 30, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: To the extent that this motion seeks continuance of the initial case management conference set for 9/5/2012, this motion 38 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/31/12. (dt)
May 1, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/1/12. (dt)
February 28, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/28/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
February 28, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 46). The Court heard argument on Defendant's Motion on February 13, 2013. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/28/13. (af)
May 2, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/2/12. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Continental Insurance Company et al v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Bus Companies Inc.
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nissan North America
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metal One Holdings America, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verizon Communications. Inc.
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qinetiq North America Operations LLC
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co. Ltd. (U.S. Branch)
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibson Guitar Corp.
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris Corporation
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OSG Ship Management, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carters Inc.
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L-3 Communications Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Keith Dalen
Represented By: Robert L. Echols
Represented By: Charles D. Killion
Represented By: Lauren Komsa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher C. Sabis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Army Corps of Engineers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]