Shelton v. Waldron et al

Defendant: Waldron and Sons' Inc., Roy Waldron, Wayne Waldron, Kevin Waldron and Joyce Waldron
Plaintiff: Barbara Shelton
Case Number: 3:2012cv00688
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/4/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 2/14/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/14/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/24/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 15, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Allow Counsel to Personally File Exhibits. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 5, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/5/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 5, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 25 is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED. Any other pending Motions are denied as moot, and the Clerk is directedto close the file. The pr etrial conference set for February 24, 2014, and the jury trial set for March 4, 2014, are canceled. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11/5/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Waldron et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldron and Sons' Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. LeVan
Represented By: Joshua G. Offutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Waldron
Represented By: Mark S. LeVan
Represented By: Joshua G. Offutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Waldron
Represented By: Mark S. LeVan
Represented By: Joshua G. Offutt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Waldron
Represented By: Joshua G. Offutt
Represented By: Mark S. LeVan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Waldron
Represented By: Joshua G. Offutt
Represented By: Mark S. LeVan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Shelton
Represented By: Lorraine Wade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]