Brooks v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Jimmy Brooks
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00821
Filed: August 10, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER: By order entered 10/23/2012 12 , the initial case management conference was rescheduled to 11/28/2012, at which time counsel for the parties called the Court and requested that the initial case management conference be rescheduled after the r esolution of the defendant's pending motion to dismiss 4 . Within one week of the resolution of the defendant's motion to dismiss, if the motion is denied in full or in part, counsel shall schedule a conference call with the Court to address rescheduling the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 12/13/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 9, 2013 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 5/9/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
January 30, 2014 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 1/30/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brooks v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Brooks
Represented By: G. Kline Preston, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Jacob Cole
Represented By: William A. Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]