Carpenter v. Social Security Administration et al

Defendant: SSA-Email Notification and Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lorena M. Carpenter
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01059
Filed: October 15, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a motion for judgment on the administrative record supported by a brief within 30 days of entry of this Order. Defendant shall, within 30 days of service of the Plaintiff's brief, file a brief in response. Reply briefs shall not be filed without leave of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 22, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: This is a civil action filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §§ 405(g) and 1383(c)(3), to obtain judicial review of the final decision of the Commissioner of Social Security finding that Plaintiff was not disabled and den ying Plaintiff Disability Insurance Benefits ("DIB") and Supplemental Security Income ("SSI"), as provided under the Social Security Act ("the Act"), as amended. The case is currently pending on Plaintiff's 14 First Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. The undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record be DENIED, and that the decision of the Commissioner be AFFIRMED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 8/22/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
October 31, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court finds the Report 22 to be well-founded and ADOPTS it in its entirety. Accordingly, the Court hereby DENIES Plaintiffs Motion 14 and AFFIRMS the decision of the Commissioner. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 10/31/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) Modified text on 10/31/2013 (hb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carpenter v. Social Security Administration et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA-Email Notification
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena M. Carpenter
Represented By: David Clyde Downard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]