Crowned Head LLC v. The National Grange of the Order of Patrons of Husbandry

Plaintiff: Crowned Head LLC
Defendant: The National Grange of the Order of Patrons of Husbandry
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01062
Filed: October 16, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 10 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/18/2013 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/21/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 20, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERa: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time is Granted. The Response to Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by 1/11/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/20/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 11, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The initial case management conference scheduled for 1/18/2013 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following a decision on this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/11/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
June 26, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Crowned Head LLC v. The National Grange of the Order of Patrons of Husbandry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crowned Head LLC
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Represented By: Todd Ryan Hambidge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Grange of the Order of Patrons of Husbandry
Represented By: Melissa Hunter Smith
Represented By: James R. Michels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]