Carr v. Federal National Mortgage Association

Plaintiff: Beverly Carr
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv01295
Filed: December 12, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2013 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/23/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
November 8, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the original detainer action that was removed to this court is hereby REMANDED to the General Sessions Court of Davidson County, Tennessee for further proceedings. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/8/2013. (xc: Clerk's Office for the General Sessions Court of Davidson County by certified mail) (hb)
March 8, 2013 8 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 7/1/2013. Discovery due by 8/30/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 10/20/2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carr v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Carr
Represented By: Christopher K. Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: John R. Wingo
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]