Koutoure Unique Tees & More, LLC v. Ramann Enterprises, Inc. et al

Defendant: Susquehanna Commercial Finance, Inc., Ramann Enterprises, Inc. and Adia Capital, LLC
Plaintiff: Koutoure Unique Tees & More, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00039
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Defendants will file a Motion to Compel Arbitration by 4/26/2013. Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Compel Arbitration will be due 5/17/2013. Defendants' Reply will be due 5/31/2013. Discovery shall be stayed u ntil a ruling on the Motion to Compel Arbitration. If the Court denies the Motion to Compel, discovery will then proceed, ending on 11/29/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/9/2014. Follow-up Case Management Conference via telephone is set for 11/5/2013 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant Ramann's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceeding 15 is GRANTED, and Defendant Susquehanna's Motion to Transfer Venue 18 is DENIED. This action is STAYED, and the Clerk is directed to close the file administratively. Plaintiff and Defendant Ramann shall notify the Court in writing, on or before September 3, 2013, as to the status of the arbitration.Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 17, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 1/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 4, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/2/2013 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/4/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koutoure Unique Tees & More, LLC v. Ramann Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susquehanna Commercial Finance, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramann Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adia Capital, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koutoure Unique Tees & More, LLC
Represented By: C. Mark Pickrell
Represented By: Andrew E. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]