Coppedge et al v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Denise Coleman, Troy M. Steffy, Richard A. Sircy, Jr. and Lloyd C. Coppedge
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00069
Filed: January 30, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and to Allow Out of State Counsel to Appear by Telephone. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 3/26/2013 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/14/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 15, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER: Ruling on the motion for admission of Ms. Sullivan pro hac vice will be deferred pending the filing of a certificate evidencing her good standing as a member of the Bar of another United States District Court and, upon the filing of such certificate, the pending motion shall be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 26, 2013 30 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 9/13/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2013. A subsequent case management conference will fall in the last week of August 2013. The Defendant will initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 28, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/1/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 3/17/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/17/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/28/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 25, 2013 33 Featured Case MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/25/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 25, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, Transfer Plaintiff Denise Coleman 15 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and Plaintiff's Pla intiff Denise Coleman's Motion To Strike 26 is DENIED, as moot. The Clerk is directed to transfer the case of Denise Coleman to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/25/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 30, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 1/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coppedge et al v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Coleman
Represented By: Susan B. Evans
Represented By: Joshua Segall
Represented By: Raymond T. Throckmorton, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy M. Steffy
Represented By: Susan B. Evans
Represented By: Joshua Segall
Represented By: Raymond T. Throckmorton, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Sircy, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Segall
Represented By: Raymond T. Throckmorton, III
Represented By: Susan B. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd C. Coppedge
Represented By: Raymond T. Throckmorton, III
Represented By: Joshua Segall
Represented By: Susan B. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Luther Wright, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]