Private Lenders Group, Inc. v. Does 1-29

Plaintiff: Private Lenders Group, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-29
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00159
Filed: February 22, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to take discovery prior to the Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 18, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER: MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 5 is DENIED as moot. Next is a motion for leave to take discovery 9 which has now been refiled in accordance with the Courts EM/ECF rules as Docket Entry No. 11 . This motion is GRANT ED and the Magistrate Judge will enter a separate order concerning this matter. Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 6/24/2013 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 22, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER : Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Docket No. 26) filed by the plaintiff, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 8/22/13. (la)
April 15, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/15/2013. At the appointed hour no one appeared. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to show cause within seven days why he failed to appear or comply with the initial case management conference. Absent a satisfactory explanation, the Magistrate Judge will impose sanctions for failing to appear and comply with the order and may recommend dismissal of the case under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 for failure to prosecute and to obey court orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Private Lenders Group, Inc. v. Does 1-29
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Private Lenders Group, Inc.
Represented By: Klinton W. Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-29
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]