Wells v. Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. et al

Defendant: Multiquip, Inc. and Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda Wells, Olivia Grace Wall, Landon Keith Wall and Grant Stefan Wall
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00194
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answers. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 8, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Substitute Answers filed by defendant United States 114 is GRANTED. The Motion to Strike Defense filed by certain plaintiffs 110 isDENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/8/14. (dt)
May 3, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2013 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. The parties shall work together to propose acceptable deadlines in a case management order to be filed 3 business in advance of the 8/5/2013 conference. By agreement, discovery is STAYED until the 8/5/2013 case management conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 3, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 1, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for a Stay because of lapse of appropriations. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/1/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 16, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/16/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
May 16, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by defendant Denyo Co., Ltd. ("Denyo") (Docket No. 53) is GRANTED, and Denyo is hereby DISMISSED from this case. It is so ORDERED. Enter this 16th day of May 2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/16/14. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wells v. Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiquip, Inc.
Represented By: S. Jacob Sappington
Represented By: Michael K. Alston
Represented By: Randy P. Scheer
Represented By: Kenneth A. Sprenger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Alan B. Easterly
Represented By: Rebecca E. Bell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Wells
Represented By: Thomas F. Mink, II
Represented By: Charles M. Duke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Grace Wall
Represented By: Charles M. Duke
Represented By: Thomas F. Mink, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landon Keith Wall
Represented By: Charles M. Duke
Represented By: Thomas F. Mink, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Stefan Wall
Represented By: Charles M. Duke
Represented By: Thomas F. Mink, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]