Genesco Inc. v. Visa, Inc. et al

Defendant: Visa U.S.A., Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa, Inc.
Plaintiff: Genesco Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00202
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2013 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 191 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in support of Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 10/31/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 31, 2013 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 193 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 10/31/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 17, 2014 297 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 1/17/14. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment text searchable version of memorandum)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
January 17, 2014 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Compel; granting 201 Motion for Protective Order; granting 235 Motion for Protective Order; granting 292 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 1/17/14. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment text searchable version of order) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
March 10, 2014 338 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/10/14. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Text Searchable Memo)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
March 11, 2014 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 299 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/11/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 18, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 7/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Text Search Memo)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 19, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum filed herewith, Visa Defendants' motion to dismiss Genesco's sixth and seventh claims (Docket Entry No. 30) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 7/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 Text Search Order) (dt)
August 15, 2014 548 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Discovery due by 10/15/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2015. Jury Trial set for 4/22/2015 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 15, 2014 549 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD AGREED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/15/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 2, 2014 551 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 550 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 9/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 2, 2014 553 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Trial is set for 4/21/2015 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2015 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 9/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 30, 2014 563 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. I hereby recuse myself from this matter. The Clerk is directed to assign this matter to another Magistrate Judge. It is so ORDERED. Magistrate Judge Joe Brown recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/30/14. (afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genesco Inc. v. Visa, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa U.S.A., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesco Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Thomas
Represented By: Douglas Meal
Represented By: Wendee M. Hilderbrand
Represented By: Seth Harrington
Represented By: Overton Thompson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]