Kimbrough v. Seahorn

Plaintiff: James Kimbrough
Defendant: Dave Seahorn
Case Number: 3:2013cv00220
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 6/7/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
June 24, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the defendant David Seahorn's motion for summary judgment be GRANTED and that defendant Madubueze Nwozo's motion for summary judgment be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 6/24/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
March 27, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/27/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(rd)
July 25, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Pending before the Court are a Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Docket No. 79) and Objections filed by the Plaintiff (Docket No. 83). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1), Fed. R. Civ . P. 72(b)(3) and Local Rule 72.03(b)(3), the Court has reviewed de novo the Report and Recommendation, the Objections, and the file. The Objections of the Plaintiff are overruled, and the Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. The Cou rt has examined the exhibits to which Plaintiff refers (Docket No. 74, Exs. A and B), and nothing therein changes the result. Accordingly, Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment (Docket Nos. 63 and 68 ) are GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED . Any other pending Motions are denied as moot, andthe Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/25/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimbrough v. Seahorn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kimbrough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Seahorn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]