Mansfield v. The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.

Defendant: The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph F. Mansfield
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00228
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/20/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2014 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 5/5/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified Text on 5/8/2013 (dt).
September 12, 2013 20 Featured Case RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by Joseph F. Mansfield. The Plaintiff has recently experienced pain in his neck and has been recommended for immediate surgery to see if the neck issues can be resolved. Because of low platelets the Plaintiff&# 039;s scheduled neck surgery has been postponed from this Friday to a later date. The Magistrate Judge recommends that this case be rescheduled for trial after the first part of October 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
September 13, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Granting 20 Recommendations. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List due by 10/3/2014. Witness List due by 10/3/2014. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/3/2014.. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/12/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
October 21, 2013 28 Featured Case SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 10/28/2013. Discovery due by 4/18/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2014. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2014 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 4, 2014 43 Featured Case ORDER: Telephone conference held on 4/3/14. The Defendant may schedule an IME and the Magistrate Judge recommends they do so as soon as practicable. The Magistrate Judge will not require the Plaintiff to delay surgery given his back pain, pending t he completion of an IME. If the IME can be completed before he undergoes a second surgery, so be it. Because of the likelihood of this second surgery, it appears that the present discovery deadlines 28 must be extended. Discovery may continue until new dates are set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/4/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mansfield v. The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Annarita M. Busbee
Represented By: John F. Floyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F. Mansfield
Represented By: Richard A. Fisher
Represented By: David L. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]