City of Hendersonville, Tennessee v. American Southern Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: City of Hendersonville, Tennessee
Defendant: Mansker Farms, LLC and American Southern Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00249
Filed: March 19, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER: Because the pending Motion to Remand cannot be decided before the initial case management conference scheduled for 5/31/2013, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following a decision on this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/20/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 26, 2013 16 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Because Mansker Farms is a Tennessee LLC, its presence in this case destroys diversity jurisdiction. It is therefore ORDERED that the Motion to Remand to State Court Docket No. 7 is GRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court For Sumner County, Tennessee, from which it was removed. Defendant American's Motion to Drop Dispensable Party Docket No. 10 is DENIED, and its Motion to Enlarge Removal Period Docket No. 9 is DENIED AS MOOT. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER. Copy mailed to Circuit Court Clerk for Sumner County, Tennesse by regular mail.)(la)
August 13, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting DE 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by City of Hendersonville, Tennessee. The City of Hendersonville, Tennessee is GRANTED attorney's fees and expenses in the total amount of $1,647.43 against defendant American Southern Insurance Company. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/13/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: City of Hendersonville, Tennessee v. American Southern Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Hendersonville, Tennessee
Represented By: John Ralph Bradley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mansker Farms, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Southern Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip L. Robertson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]