Reinsdorf v. Academy, Ltd.

Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Academy, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Richard Reinsdorf
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00269
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: I hereby RECUSE myself in this case. The Clerk is directed to reassign the case to another Magistrate Judge. The initial case management conference, scheduled on 5/13/2013, is CANCELLED, to be rescheduled by the Magistrate Judge to whom the ca se is reassigned. Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/19/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/28/2013 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Prior to the hearing, counsel for the parties are directed to confer on a Proposed Case Management Order for the progression of this case, which shall be submitted 3 days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/22/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 3, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendant shall file its Reply by 5/10/2013. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 16, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/16/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 16, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument 25 is DENIED. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendant's Motion to Stay 9 is GRANTED, and this action is stayed, pending resolution of the related California action. T he Clerk shall close this file administratively. The parties shall notify the Court within 10 days of resolution of the California action. In any event, the parties shall file a Status Report with the Court by September 1, 2013. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/16/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 10, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This matter is before the Court upon Plaintiffs "Motion for an Order Regarding the Preservation of Evidence." Docket No. 36 . Plaintiff has filed a supporting Memorandum. Docket No. 37 . Defendant has filed a Response in Opposit ion to the Motion. Docket No. 40 . Judge Campbell has referred the Motion to the undersigned for decision. Docket No. 39 . It can readily be seen that Plaintiff essentially wants the Court to grant a discovery request that has not been made. Pl aintiffs "evidence" that Defendant may have already spoliated evidence is not convincing. As Defendant argues, "If a formal motion were required in every case to reaffirm the parties' pre-existing preservation obligations, the Court's docket would be hopelessly clogged by pointless motion after pointless motion." Docket No. 40 , p. 2. For the foregoing reasons, the instant Motion (Docket No. 36 ) is DENIED. It is so Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/10/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
March 26, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge.This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reinsdorf v. Academy, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy, Ltd.
Represented By: Charles Robert Bone
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli
Represented By: Robert C. Welsh
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Reinsdorf
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Timothy G. Harvey
Represented By: Harvey Geller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]