Pearl Corporation et al v. Randall May International, Inc.

Defendant: Randall May International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pearl Corporation and Pearl Musical Instrument Manufacturing Company Limited
Case Number: 3:2013cv00279
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A Case Management Conference by telephone is set for 5/2/2013 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Counsel shall call 615-695-2857 in order to participate in this conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 2, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone conference held on 5/2/2013. Counsel shall confer and file by 5/16/2013, a proposed initial case management order. This order shall include a proposed briefing schedule for plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. The de adline by which plaintiffs shall respond to defendants pending motion to dismiss or transfer 21 is EXTENDED to Friday, 5/17/2013. The initial case management conference initially noticed for 5/20/2013 4 , is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 5/2/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 4, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case has been referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for customized case management and for scheduling of discovery, briefing and a recommended target hearing date for plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 5 and [6 ]. Discovery shall commence immediately. All discovery related to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction shall be completed by 9/3/2013. Target hearing date on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is Monday, 10/28/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 6/4/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 4, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Bench Trial set for 6/10/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/4/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 6, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike 31 is DENIED, and Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Or Transfer 21 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The request to dismiss is DENIED, and t he request to transfer is GRANTED. Accordingly, this action is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California, as related to the pending case of Randall May International, Inc. v. Pearl Corp., and Pearl Musical Instrument Co., Case No. SACV13-00016 JVS (RNBx). Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/6/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearl Corporation et al v. Randall May International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall May International, Inc.
Represented By: Kainoa Asuega
Represented By: George H. Cate, III
Represented By: Lester Julian Savit
Represented By: Andrew A. Warth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Corporation
Represented By: Paige Waldrop Mills
Represented By: Brian R. Iverson
Represented By: Terry L. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Musical Instrument Manufacturing Company Limited
Represented By: Brian R. Iverson
Represented By: Terry L. Clark
Represented By: Paige Waldrop Mills
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]