Summerrow v. Chattanooga Boiler and Tank et al

Defendant: Chattanooga Boiler and Tank, Tom Schull and Mike McMinn
Plaintiff: Julius Summerrow
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00297
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/22/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 20, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 21 Motion to Dismiss. The Magistrate Judge recommends that the Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, and that the complaint against them be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/20/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
September 9, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the bench trial set for October 7, 2014 and the pretrial conference set for September 19, 2014 are CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, by later order of the court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail) (ds)
September 9, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion for Rule 16 Telephone Conference or to Ascertain Status. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (ds)
September 10, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Mindful of the fact that Plaintiff Summerrow is now proceeding pro se, the Magistrate Judge GRANTS Plaintiff an extension of time to and including Wednesday, October 8, 2014, within which to file a response to the pending motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry No. 33). Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 9/10/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
September 22, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 38 is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants Schull and McMinn 21 is GRANTED, and all claims against these two defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This case shall be RETURNED to the Magistrate Judge for further handling under theoriginal referral Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/22/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Summerrow v. Chattanooga Boiler and Tank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Boiler and Tank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Schull
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McMinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Summerrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]