Joyner v. AT&T Corp. et al

Defendant: AT&T Corp., BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. and BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC
Plaintiff: Eric L. Joyner
Case Number: 3:2013cv00298
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/10/2013 at 2:00 PM to discuss the setting of a date for a scheduling conference. To participate in the conference call, parties will call 615-695-2851 at the scheduled time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 12/5/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 18, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery deadline is reset for 3/28/2014. Dispositive Motions deadline reset for 4/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/18/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 23, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A lengthy telephone conference was held with the parties about several discovery issues. The Magistrate Judge has previously set a hearing for April 24, 2014 29 to discuss other discovery issues. To the extent issues remain, the parties should provide a brief description of them by the close of business on April 23, 2014, and be prepared to take up any remaining issues on April 24th. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/23/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 24, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/15/2014 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. To participate in the conference call, parties will call 615-695-2851 at the scheduled time. The parties are requested to submit to the Magistrate Judge b y noon on May 14, 2014, to brownchambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov, a statement of any discovery issues that remain concerning the Rule 30(b)(6) and a draft revision to the scheduling order suggesting deadlines for discovery, dispositive motions, and a recommended trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/24/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 31, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/14/2015 at 9:00 AM and Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2015 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List, Witness List, and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/30/2015. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for all other deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/31/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
September 5, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Partial Dismissal (Docket No. 40), indicating that Plaintiff wishes to dismiss certain of his claims. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims brought under the Family and Medical Leave Act are DI SMISSED; and Plaintiff's claims for discrimination and harassment based on sexual orientation and gender stereotyping are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's remaining claims will be tried, as previously scheduled, on April 14, 2015 (Docket No. 38). Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/5/2014. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joyner v. AT&T Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric L. Joyner
Represented By: Ann Buntin Steiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]