Anderson v. McIntosh Construction, LLC et al

Defendant: Vantacore Partners, LP and McIntosh Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Anderson
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00304
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 10 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 17, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 8/12/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2014 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 8/5/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 4, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit Set for Dispositive Motion Briefs. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/4/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 13, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 28, 2014 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM. An appropriate order will enter. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
May 28, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 15 is GRANTED. The plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Entry of this Order shall constitute judgment in the case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/28/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Anderson v. McIntosh Construction, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantacore Partners, LP
Represented By: Lawrence Slade Eastwood, Jr.
Represented By: Megan M. Sutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McIntosh Construction, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Slade Eastwood, Jr.
Represented By: Megan M. Sutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Anderson
Represented By: Andy L. Allman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]