Driver v. Sator et al

Defendant: Unknown Persons, Paul Alexander and Corizon Medical Services
Plaintiff: Jerry Lynn Driver
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00364
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/17/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 1, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/1/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
July 2, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Declaration of Defendant Dr. Alexander shows that Plaintiff does not have a strong likelihood of success on the merits. Additionally, the Declaration of Dr. Alexande r shows that, to a reasonable degree of medical certainty, it is unlikely that Plaintiff will suffer liver damage, cancer, or death caused by taking Tylenol #3 at the prescribed dosage. Given the foregoing, it is very clear that Plaintiff is not e ntitled to a temporary or preliminary injunction. For those reasons, the instant Motion (Docket No. 26) should be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/2/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
July 24, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 40 Report and Recommendation. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion For Temporary Injunction (Docket No. 26 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
August 1, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Order Incorrectly Entered (Docket No. 58 ) is GRANTED. By inadvertence, this court accepted the Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 40 ) prior to the extended deadline for objections (Docket No. 51 ). It is therefore ORDERED that the Order accepting the Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 55 ) is hereby VACATED. The court will consider the Objections filed by the plaintiff (Docket No. 57 ), to which it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants shall respond within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/1/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (hb)
September 3, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
September 3, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Before the court is the plaintiff's Objection (ECF No. 57 ) to Magistrate Judge Cliff Knowles' July 2, 2013 Report and Recommendation ("R&R") (ECF No. 40 ), in which Magistrate Judge Knowles recommends denying the plai ntiff's Motion for Temporary Injunction (ECF No. 26 ). As set forth in the accompanying memorandum opinion, the court has considered de novo the portions of the R&R to which objections are lodged and finds no error in the magistrate judge 9;s findings of fact or conclusions of law. The plaintiff's objections are therefore OVERRULED; the R&R is ACCEPTED; and the plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. 26 ) is DENIED. This matter remains REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Knowles. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/3/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(hb)
September 10, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 59 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint. For the foregoing reasons, the undersigned recommends that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/10/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 31, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/31/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 31, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The R&R recommending that the plaintiff's motion to amend be denied (ECF No. 70 ) is REJECTED, and the plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint 59 is GRANTED. However, insofar as the amended complaint might be construed to stat e claims against Hospital Administrator Tim McConnell or to state a medical-malpractice claim against Dr. Alexander, such claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The court further finds that, although the plaintiff is subject to the three-strikes rule contained in 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (g), the plaintiff alleges imminent danger of serious physical injury and is therefore entitled to continue to proceed in forma pauperis. The recommendation (ECF No. 73 ) that the plaintiff's pauper status be revoked is therefore REJECTED. Defendants' Dr. Alexander and Corizon's motion to dismiss the complaint on the grounds that the plaintiff is not entitled to proceed in forma pauperis and their alternative motion for revocation of paupe r status (ECF No. 45 ) is therefore DENIED except insofar as the defendants seek dismissal of any potential medical-malpractice claims. Such medical-malpractice claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Likewise, the court REJECTS the recommendation that defendant First Medical Management's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 47 ) be granted, and DENIES FMM's motion to dismiss, except insofar as it seeks dismissal of any state-law claims for medical malpractice. Such medical-malpractice cla ims are DISMISSED. If FMM believes it is entitled to judgment in its favor on statute-of-limitation grounds, it must file a properly supported motion for summary judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. This matter remains REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Knowles. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/31/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) Modified text on 10/31/2013 (hb).
November 4, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/4/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Magistrate Judge shall conduct the pretrial conference andenter a pretrial order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/4/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Driver v. Sator et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Persons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lynn Driver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]