Simmons v. Taylor

Petitioner: Tarina Shantayne Simmons
Respondent: Sharon Taylor
Case Number: 3:2013cv00436
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. An appropriate order will be entered. Rule 8(a), Rules - - -§ 2254 Cases. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/14/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
June 25, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The pro se petitioner is hereby GRANTED 30 days from the date of entry of this order on the docket in which to file whatever reply to the respondent's Rule 60(b)(1) Motion that she may deem appropriate. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/25/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 24, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court finds that the petitioner has failed to make an adequate showing of entitlement to an equitable tolling of the limitation period. For that reason, the Court GRANTS the respondent's Motion for Relief from Order Denying the Mot ion to Dismiss. The order 17 denying the respondent's Motion to Dismiss is VACATED. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the instant action as untimely is GRANTED and this action is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/24/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 16, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Accordingly, the Court finds no merit in the petitioner's Motion to Reconsider. Said Motion, therefore, is hereby DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/16/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
August 28, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The petitioner is hereby GRANTED thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order on the docket in which to submit to the Clerk of this Court either the full appellate filing fee of four hundred fifty five dollars ($455) or an application to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail; 6CCA via email)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tarina Shantayne Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sharon Taylor
Represented By: Nicholas White Spangler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]