Harding v. Davidson County Sheriff Office et al

Defendant: L. T. Garmon, f/n/u Holland and L. Mitchell
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Harding
Case Number: 3:2013cv00449
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Report and Recommendation (Docket Entry No. 25 ) is hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED. The Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Michael Garmon and Joshua Holland (Docket Entry No. 15 ) is hereby GRANTED. The c laims against Defendants Michael Garmon and Joshua Holland are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This action is hereby returned to the Magistrate Judge for further pretrial management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 for claims against the remaining defendant, LeRonce Mitchell. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/25/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 20, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 5/20/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 17, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Motion For Summary Judgment 33 be GRANTED and that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court further RECOMMENDS that any appeal NOT be certified under 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(a)(3) as taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/17/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 25, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 41 is hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED. Defendant Leronce Mitchell's Motion for Summary Judgment 33 is hereby GRANTED. All other pending motions are hereby TERMINATED as moot. This case is hereby DISMISSED W ITH PREJUDICE. The Court hereby certifies that any appeal would not be taken in good faith. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in a separate document in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/25/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding v. Davidson County Sheriff Office et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. T. Garmon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Holland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Harding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]