United States of America v. $33,572.00 United States Currency

Defendant: $33,572.00 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2013cv00555
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This Motion to Withdraw Filings 9 is Granted and Defendant's Motion 5 is Denied as Moot. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 17, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Lift Stay and to Dismiss Claimant's Claim. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/17/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 3, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY OF DEFAULT: Upon motion 17 of the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered as to the Defendant $33,572.00 United States currency as to Pedro Reyes-Reyes and all persons and entities who may have an interest in Defendant Property, as provided in Rule 55(a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 4/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified Text on 4/4/2014 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $33,572.00 United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,572.00 United States Currency
Represented By: Isaiah S. Gant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]